NY A06211 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - amend and recommit to rules 6211b
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes payments to nonparticipating or nonpreferred providers of ambulance services licensed under article 30 of the public health law; exempts a city with a population of one million or more persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes payments to nonparticipating or nonpreferred providers of ambulance services licensed under article 30 of the public health law; exempts a city with a population of one million or more persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 6211b
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-31Assemblyprint number 6211a
2019-05-31Assemblyamend and recommit to insurance
2019-03-04Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S03526 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06211
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06211A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06211B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback