NY A06212 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.470
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.470
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the operation of certain bingo games run by retirement communities and social or charitable organizations to no more than 1 day per week and no more than 30 times per year.
Title
Limits the operation of certain bingo games run by retirement communities and social or charitable organizations to no more than 1 day per week and no more than 30 times per year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.470 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.526 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a6212a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3917A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-08 | Senate | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.350 |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s3917a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.526 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | print number 6212a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S03917 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.470