NY A06215 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits member items in the 2012-2013 budget from fiscal year April 1, 2012 to March 31, 2013.
Title
Prohibits member items in the 2012-2013 budget from fiscal year April 1, 2012 to March 31, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-11-21 | Assembly | print number 6215a |
2011-11-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2011-03-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |