NY A06215 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of taxation and finance to develop in consultation with the director of the New York State Division of Veterans' Affairs a listing of documents to be used to establish eligibility for certain property tax exemptions.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of taxation and finance to develop in consultation with the director of the New York State Division of Veterans' Affairs a listing of documents to be used to establish eligibility for certain property tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] |
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-07 | Senate | signed chap.426 |
2014-11-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1385 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4810 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.472 |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-03-15 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S04810 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6215