NY A06244 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to posting information regarding the issuance of permits for a public water supply on the department of environmental conservation's website.
Title
Relates to posting information regarding the issuance of permits for a public water supply on the department of environmental conservation's website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.458 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-15 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-15 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.302 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | substituted for a6244 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.308 |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | substituted by s1724 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.302 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01724 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.458