NY A06291 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - substituted by s3858b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - substituted by s3858b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the possession, sale, barter, offer, purchase, transportation, delivery, or receipt of bear gallbladder, bile, or any product, item, or substance containing, or labeled or advertised as containing, bear gallbladders or bile; exempts federal and state government.
Title
Prohibits the possession, sale, barter, offer, purchase, transportation, delivery, or receipt of bear gallbladder, bile, or any product, item, or substance containing, or labeled or advertised as containing, bear gallbladders or bile; exempts federal and state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s3858b |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.401 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | print number 6291a |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2011-03-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03858 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.468