NY A06291 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the additional one percent sales tax for Wayne county.
Title
Extends the additional one percent sales tax for Wayne county.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Oaks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4941 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.545 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.545 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04941 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.196