NY A06292 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - signed chap.183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - signed chap.183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the pension poaching prevention act to prevent financial planners, insurance agents, and other professionals from luring veterans and their family members to pay substantial funds for veterans' benefits services that the offering entity is unqualified to provide and that can detrimentally impact the future financial situations of the veteran and his or her dependents.
Title
Enacts the pension poaching prevention act to prevent financial planners, insurance agents, and other professionals from luring veterans and their family members to pay substantial funds for veterans' benefits services that the offering entity is unqualified to provide and that can detrimentally impact the future financial situations of the veteran and his or her dependents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | signed chap.183 |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.821 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4807 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.258 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S04807 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - signed chap.183