NY A06293 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of the city of New York, the issuance of bonds or notes with variable rates of interest, interest rate exchange agreements of the city of New York, the refunding of bonds, and the down payment for projects financed by bonds; amends the New York state financial emergency act for the city of New York; makes further amendments relating to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of the city of New York, the issuance of bonds or notes with variable rates of interest, interest rate exchange agreements of the city of New York, the refunding of bonds, and the down payment for projects financed by bonds; amends the New York state financial emergency act for the city of New York; makes further amendments relating to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.75 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.451 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6293b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4197B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | referred to cities |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.793 |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4197A |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4197b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.451 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.451 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | print number 6293b |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | print number 6293a |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S04197 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.75