NY A06295 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-5)
Status: Passed on December 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-09 - APPROVAL MEMO.34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-5)
Status: Passed on December 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-09 - APPROVAL MEMO.34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits household cleansing products, cosmetic products and personal care products that contain 1,4-dioxane.
Title
Prohibits household cleansing products, cosmetic products and personal care products that contain 1,4-dioxane.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.34 |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.613 |
2019-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.528 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a6295a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1548 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4389B |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4389A |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4389b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6295a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.528 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04389 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - APPROVAL MEMO.34