NY A06297 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to prominently identify on any job posting that meets the requirements of section 55-c of the civil service law that such job is "55-c Eligible".
Title
Requires state agencies to prominently identify on any job posting that meets the requirements of section 55-c of the civil service law that such job is "55-c Eligible".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.486 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-15 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-15 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.303 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | substituted for a6297 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.404 |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | substituted by s3300 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.303 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03300 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.486