NY A06314 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the enactment or enforcement of local laws or ordinances requiring the monitoring of groundwater impacts resulting from mining or the reclamation of mines within counties with a population of one million or more which draws its primary source of drinking water for a majority of county residents from a designated sole source aquifer.
Title
Authorizes the enactment or enforcement of local laws or ordinances requiring the monitoring of groundwater impacts resulting from mining or the reclamation of mines within counties with a population of one million or more which draws its primary source of drinking water for a majority of county residents from a designated sole source aquifer.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] |
Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.298 |
2018-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-05-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1026 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4812 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.450 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.221 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.221 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04812 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6314