NY A06316 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the final maturity of bonds issued for the purpose of financing amounts deposited into the water pollution control revolving fund.
Title
Relates to the final maturity of bonds issued for the purpose of financing amounts deposited into the water pollution control revolving fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04520 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE