NY A06320 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Grants Danielle Galasso a retroactive membership date in the New York state and local employees' retirement system for service starting in 2003.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants Danielle Galasso a retroactive membership date in the New York state and local employees' retirement system for service starting in 2003.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.281
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2043
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5743A
2018-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.443
2018-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.443
2018-06-20Assemblyreported
2018-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-25Assemblyprint number 6320a
2018-04-25Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2017-03-02Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S05743 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6320A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06320&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06320&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06320
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06320&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06320A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06320&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06320&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06320&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6320#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06320&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback