NY A06324 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - signed chap.417
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes penalties for licensed barbers who sell alcohol to persons under the age of twenty-one years, including the loss of barbering license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes penalties for licensed barbers who sell alcohol to persons under the age of twenty-one years, including the loss of barbering license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-17Senatesigned chap.417
2011-08-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2011-06-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-06-22Senate3RD READING CAL.220
2011-06-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1880B
2011-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2011-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2011-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.525
2011-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.525
2011-06-20Assemblyreported
2011-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-06-17Assemblyprint number 6324b
2011-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2011-06-13Assemblyreported referred to codes
2011-06-10Assemblyprint number 6324a
2011-06-10Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to economic development
2011-03-14Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S01880 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6324B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06324&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06324&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06324
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06324&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06324A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06324&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06324B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06324&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A6324#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback