NY A06330 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - advanced to third reading cal.424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "women on corporate boards study"; requires the department of state, in collaboration with the department of taxation and finance, to conduct a study on the number of women directors who serve on each board of directors of domestic corporations and foreign corporations authorized to do business in New York state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "women on corporate boards study"; requires the department of state, in collaboration with the department of taxation and finance, to conduct a study on the number of women directors who serve on each board of directors of domestic corporations and foreign corporations authorized to do business in New York state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.424
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-06Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S04278 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback