NY A06336 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into certain contracts with out-of-state school districts related to existing technology products, including computer programs and software packages that help students learn and assist districts with achieving greater efficiencies; defines "out-of-state public school"; changes the term "common core" to "next generation" standards or curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into certain contracts with out-of-state school districts related to existing technology products, including computer programs and software packages that help students learn and assist districts with achieving greater efficiencies; defines "out-of-state public school"; changes the term "common core" to "next generation" standards or curriculum.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2019-04-24Assemblyprint number 6336c
2019-04-24Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2019-04-22Assemblyprint number 6336b
2019-04-22Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2019-04-15Assemblyprint number 6336a
2019-04-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to education
2019-03-06Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S04300 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback