NY A06338 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.597
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.597
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no covenant, restriction, or condition contained in any deed, contract, security instrument, or other instrument affecting the transfer or sale of any interest in a condominium and any by-laws that prohibits or unreasonably restricts the installation or use of an electric vehicle charging station is void.
Title
Provides that no covenant, restriction, or condition contained in any deed, contract, security instrument, or other instrument affecting the transfer or sale of any interest in a condominium and any by-laws that prohibits or unreasonably restricts the installation or use of an electric vehicle charging station is void.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.597 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.365 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a6338a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1554 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5157A |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5157a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.365 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.365 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 6338a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05157 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.597