NY A06357 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the residency requirement for the city attorney in the city of Mechanicville, Saratoga county.
Title
Waives the residency requirement for the city attorney in the city of Mechanicville, Saratoga county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.461 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.530 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a6357 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.171 |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s2068 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.530 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02068 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.461