NY A06364 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets up rules and regulations for the operation of lease-hold retirement communities to provide adequate housing for senior citizens wishing to retire and locate in a lease-hold retirement community; grants owners of homes in lease-hold retirement communities the right to sell their homes by methods common to sales of residential property; requires that owners of lease-hold retirement communities offer owners of homes the option to sign a long-term ninety-nine year lease.
Title
Sets up rules and regulations for the operation of lease-hold retirement communities to provide adequate housing for senior citizens wishing to retire and locate in a lease-hold retirement community; grants owners of homes in lease-hold retirement communities the right to sell their homes by methods common to sales of residential property; requires that owners of lease-hold retirement communities offer owners of homes the option to sign a long-term ninety-nine year lease.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | print number 6364a |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S04316 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - PRINT NUMBER 4316A