NY A06370 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "tenant" for the purposes of required notice during a mortgage foreclosure action.
Title
Expands the definition of "tenant" for the purposes of required notice during a mortgage foreclosure action.
Sponsors
Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.57 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.354 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.214 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5357 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.235 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.304 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05357 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.57