NY A06434 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption for the sale of the first $35,000 for a battery, electric, or plug-in hybrid electric vehicle from state sales and compensating use taxes; authorizes local governments to elect such incentives.
Title
Provides an exemption for the sale of the first $35,000 for a battery, electric, or plug-in hybrid electric vehicle from state sales and compensating use taxes; authorizes local governments to elect such incentives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | print number 6434a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03827 (Same As) 2020-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3827B