NY A06449 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reduces the limitations on the number of schools in the city of New York at which photo speed violation monitoring systems may be utilized and the times during which they may be operated; requires such city to install signs giving notice of the use of such a system; and extends the expiration of such program until July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces the limitations on the number of schools in the city of New York at which photo speed violation monitoring systems may be utilized and the times during which they may be operated; requires such city to install signs giving notice of the use of such a system; and extends the expiration of such program until July 1, 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-19Senate3RD READING CAL.237
2019-03-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4331
2019-03-19SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-19Assemblyhome rule request
2019-03-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.41
2019-03-19Assemblyrules report cal.41
2019-03-18Assemblyreported
2019-03-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-07Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S04331 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6449

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06449&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06449&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06449
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06449&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06449&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06449&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06449&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6449#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06449&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback