NY A06456 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - print number 6456b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - print number 6456b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the New York state school resource officer program for school districts outside of New York City; requires retired police officers be certified by the department of education to become school resource officers; allows retired police officers employed as school resource officers to carry a firearm on school grounds given an appropriate license; relates to the earnings limitations for retired police officers employed as a school resource officer.
Title
Creates the New York state school resource officer program for school districts outside of New York City; requires retired police officers be certified by the department of education to become school resource officers; allows retired police officers employed as school resource officers to carry a firearm on school grounds given an appropriate license; relates to the earnings limitations for retired police officers employed as a school resource officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | print number 6456b |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | print number 6456a |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06298 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 6298A