NY A06464 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the not-for-profit corporation Jamison Road Fire Benevolent Association, Inc. for all persons who are now, or have been, or hereafter become active volunteers of the Jamison Road Volunteer Fire Company, Inc., in the county of Erie and who have acquired or shall hereafter acquire the status of exempt volunteer firefighter; makes related provisions.
Title
Creates the not-for-profit corporation Jamison Road Fire Benevolent Association, Inc. for all persons who are now, or have been, or hereafter become active volunteers of the Jamison Road Volunteer Fire Company, Inc., in the county of Erie and who have acquired or shall hereafter acquire the status of exempt volunteer firefighter; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.366 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.686 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a6464 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.382 |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3476 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.686 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03476 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.366