NY A06468 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from the South Huntington Union Free School District an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from the South Huntington Union Free School District an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.403 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.494 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a6468 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.386 |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4161 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.494 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.494 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04161 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.403