NY A06471 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reviewing suicide prevention programs periodically and making recommendations regarding cultural and linguistic competency and best practices for screening and interventions aimed at addressing suicide risk factors for minority groups and other underrepresented populations.
Title
Relates to reviewing suicide prevention programs periodically and making recommendations regarding cultural and linguistic competency and best practices for screening and interventions aimed at addressing suicide risk factors for minority groups and other underrepresented populations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.630 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.90 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | substituted for a6471 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.71 |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s2403 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.90 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.90 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S02403 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.630