NY A06478 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires healthcare workers who are reasonably expected to practice in close proximity to children less than twelve months of age to be vaccinated against pertussis.
Title
Requires healthcare workers who are reasonably expected to practice in close proximity to children less than twelve months of age to be vaccinated against pertussis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 6478b |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | print number 6478a |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05909 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH