NY A06489 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to defraying costs of aggregating, processing and transporting agricultural products for producers and processors.
Title
Relates to defraying costs of aggregating, processing and transporting agricultural products for producers and processors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.180 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.454 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a6489 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.732 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4653 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.454 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.454 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04653 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.180