NY A06491 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York city transit authority to contract with mass transit entities including the Long Island Rail Road and the Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company to provide a minimum twenty-five percent discount for college students.
Title
Authorizes the New York city transit authority to contract with mass transit entities including the Long Island Rail Road and the Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company to provide a minimum twenty-five percent discount for college students.
Sponsors
Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 6491a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04897 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION