NY A06493 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-08 - approval memo.17
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-08 - approval memo.17
Summary
This bill amends New York's labor law and prompt pay law to ensure greater enforcement mechanisms are available for employees, contractors and subcontractors.
Title
Relates to the prompt payment of employees and contractors engaged in private construction projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-08 | approval memo.17 | |
2009-09-08 | signed chap.417 | |
2009-08-31 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.933 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5982 | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.534 | |
2009-06-22 | rules report cal.534 | |
2009-06-22 | reported | |
2009-06-10 | amend and recommit to rules 6493d | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-05-28 | print number 6493c | |
2009-05-28 | amend and recommit to labor | |
2009-05-11 | print number 6493b | |
2009-05-11 | amend and recommit to labor | |
2009-03-23 | print number 6493a | |
2009-03-23 | amend and recommit to labor | |
2009-03-06 | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S5982 (Same As) 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6493D
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06493&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |