NY A06504 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.549
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.549
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the exemption of certain parcels of land.
Title
Relates to the exemption of certain parcels of land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.549 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.276 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6504a |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1245A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.960 |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s1245a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.276 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.276 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | print number 6504a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S01245 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.549