NY A06510 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the petitioner for appointment as the guardian for an incapacitated person to identify all other persons who may be able to manage the affairs of such incapacitated person; prohibits appointment solely for the purposes of bill collection or resolving a bill collection dispute.
Title
Requires the petitioner for appointment as the guardian for an incapacitated person to identify all other persons who may be able to manage the affairs of such incapacitated person; prohibits appointment solely for the purposes of bill collection or resolving a bill collection dispute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.248 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.498 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.498 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | print number 6510a |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04642 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES