NY A06520 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the marine mammal and sea turtle protection area.
Title
Relates to establishing the marine mammal and sea turtle protection area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | approval memo.50 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.661 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1404 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5871 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.532 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05871 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - approval memo.50