NY A06542 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.697
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.697
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the village of Mamaroneck occupancy tax for three years.
Title
Extends the village of Mamaroneck occupancy tax for three years.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.697 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.503 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5081 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.354 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05081 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.697