NY A06546 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Broome county to impose an additional surcharge to pay for the costs associated with updating the telecommunication equipment and telephone services needed to provide an enhanced 911 emergency telephone system to serve such county and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes Broome county to impose an additional surcharge to pay for the costs associated with updating the telecommunication equipment and telephone services needed to provide an enhanced 911 emergency telephone system to serve such county and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Senate | signed chap.120 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1549 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4392 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.261 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04392 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - signed chap.120