NY A06548 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Chenango to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to four percent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Chenango to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to four percent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-05-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-20Assemblyhome rule request
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.355
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-03-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S04419 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback