NY A06551 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a person performing the functions of assistant district attorney or senior assistant district attorney in Cayuga county to be a resident of either Cayuga county or an adjoining county.
Title
Permits a person performing the functions of assistant district attorney or senior assistant district attorney in Cayuga county to be a resident of either Cayuga county or an adjoining county.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Finch [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.464 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.370 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6551 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.175 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3115 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.370 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.370 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03115 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.464