NY A06554 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents abuse during discovery.
Title
Prevents abuse during discovery.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Edward Hennessey [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Michele Titus [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.205 |
2013-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1019 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4850 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.171 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04850 (Same As) 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6554