NY A06566 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the geriatric demonstration program to promote mental health and home care collaboration; authorizes the commissioner of mental health to identify barriers to participation in the program and make recommendations to address such barriers.
Title
Relates to the geriatric demonstration program to promote mental health and home care collaboration; authorizes the commissioner of mental health to identify barriers to participation in the program and make recommendations to address such barriers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.233 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.233 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | print number 6566b |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2019-04-05 | Assembly | print number 6566a |
2019-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S03872 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - referred to mental health
S08745 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
S08745 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - REFERRED TO RULES