NY A06572 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - substituted by s4248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - substituted by s4248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to term of service of trustee-elects of the Mount Vernon board of education during the 2011 and 2012 elections.
Title
Relates to term of service of trustee-elects of the Mount Vernon board of education during the 2011 and 2012 elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Assembly | substituted by s4248 |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.227 |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04248 (Same As) 2011-05-11 - SIGNED CHAP.18