NY A06572 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - signed chap.326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - signed chap.326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending authorization for the imposition of additional sales tax in Fulton County until 2015.
Title
Relates to extending authorization for the imposition of additional sales tax in Fulton County until 2015.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Senate | signed chap.326 |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.868 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4555 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.133 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04555 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6572