NY A06592 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to decreasing the length of the suspension period applicable to certain individuals who lose their jobs due to a labor dispute, such as a strike, and who seek to obtain unemployment insurance benefits; decreases the suspension period from seven consecutive weeks to seven consecutive calendar days; and permits the waiting period to be served during a suspension period.
Title
Relates to decreasing the length of the suspension period applicable to certain individuals who lose their jobs due to a labor dispute, such as a strike, and who seek to obtain unemployment insurance benefits; decreases the suspension period from seven consecutive weeks to seven consecutive calendar days; and permits the waiting period to be served during a suspension period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.755 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.645 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a6592 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | referred to labor |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.447 |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4573 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.645 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04573 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.755