NY A06597 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - print number 6597a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to informal caregiver training; defines "person in need of assistance"; and expands who may serve as an "informal caregiver".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to informal caregiver training; defines "person in need of assistance"; and expands who may serve as an "informal caregiver".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20Assemblyprint number 6597a
2019-05-20Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-12Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S05209 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback