NY A06599 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires organizations that receive funds for capital improvements by the New York state dormitory authority and the urban development corporation to use such funds for the purchase of energy star equipment and appliances where available; defines energy star.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires organizations that receive funds for capital improvements by the New York state dormitory authority and the urban development corporation to use such funds for the purchase of energy star equipment and appliances where available; defines energy star.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1806
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S31
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.277
2019-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.277
2019-06-14Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-12Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S00031 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6599

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06599&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06599&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06599
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06599&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06599&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06599&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06599&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6599#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback