NY A06637 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 6637a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 6637a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires entities that submit records to state agencies that are excepted from disclosure under FOIL to periodically re-apply for the exception.
Title
Requires entities that submit records to state agencies that are excepted from disclosure under FOIL to periodically re-apply for the exception.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 6637a |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02921 (Same As) 2016-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 2921A