NY A06637 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of possible conflicts; provides for the vacating of an arbitration award on the ground that the arbitrator was affiliated in any way with any party, or has a financial interest directly or indirectly in any party or in the outcome of the arbitration.
Title
Requires disclosure of possible conflicts; provides for the vacating of an arbitration award on the ground that the arbitrator was affiliated in any way with any party, or has a financial interest directly or indirectly in any party or in the outcome of the arbitration.
Sponsors
Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] |
Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.675 |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08710 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY