NY A06650 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.240
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.240
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires written notification to an employee when an employer modifies or replaces a health policy regarding contraceptive coverage.
Title
Requires written notification to an employee when an employer modifies or replaces a health policy regarding contraceptive coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.240 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6650a |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.262 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03120 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN