NY A06653 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-16 - SIGNED CHAP.374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-16 - SIGNED CHAP.374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes prosecution where a person receives a presidential reprieve, pardon or other form of clemency when certain conditions are met.
Title
Authorizes prosecution where a person receives a presidential reprieve, pardon or other form of clemency when certain conditions are met.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.374 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.62 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | substituted for a6653 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.394 |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | substituted by s4572 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.62 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04572 (Same As) 2019-10-16 - SIGNED CHAP.374