NY A06665 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends a provision of law regarding the disposal of surplus computer equipment by political subdivisions.
Title
Extends a provision of law regarding the disposal of surplus computer equipment by political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.60 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.823 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5409 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.263 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05409 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.60